U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00194
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF8 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. ST PIERRE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
  • October 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.