U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00196
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. INGRISANO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.