U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00208
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST et al v. KELLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.