U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00315
  • Case Name: GLADU v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • February 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.