open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Maine

MAINE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Maine
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00164-1
    Party Name:USA v. CROWLEY
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Waive Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order in a Criminal Case]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Financial Declaration]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.med.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57008
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =