U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00285
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. BRIGGS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.