U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00218
  • Case Name: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. BUTLER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
July, 2020
  • July 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.