U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00279
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA v. YEATON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.