U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00343
  • Case Name: HALLETT v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.