U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00309
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. FRAZEE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.