U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00154
  • Case Name: FURNITURE MATTRESSES & MORE LLC v. TEXAS RUSTIC INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.