U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00399
  • Case Name: STONE v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Objection]
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.