U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00210
  • Case Name: SWENSON v. FALMOUTH PUBLIC SCHOOLS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.