U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00448
  • Case Name: SHIELDS v. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Record for Judicial Review (ERISA)]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Objection]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Record for Judicial Review (ERISA)]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order-ERISA Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.