U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00504
  • Case Name: CARL v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.