U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00124
  • Case Name: LUKASAK v. PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Answer Deadline]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.