U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00572
  • Case Name: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. VIGNEAULT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Bench Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.