U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00082
  • Case Name: CORINTH PELLETS LLC v. ANDRITZ INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 18, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.