U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00091
  • Case Name: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. NICHOLS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.