U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00201
  • Case Name: NAES CORPORATION v. COASTAL RESOURCES OF MAINE LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attachment & Trustee Process]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.