U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00171
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. PLUMMER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.