U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00287
  • Case Name: CHASE v. CITY OF BANGOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Objection]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.