U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00333
  • Case Name: CAF-REO-1 LLC v. LH ACQUISITIONS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.