U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00055
  • Case Name: ACA CONNECTS - AMERICA'S COMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION et al v. FREY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.