U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00382
  • Case Name: SIERRA CLUB v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.