U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00439
  • Case Name: LAMORE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2022: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.