U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00380
  • Case Name: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF11 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. VINCENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.