U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00078
  • Case Name: WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 v. HOULE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.