U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00465
  • Case Name: QUDUS v. WASHINGTON COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.