U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00068
  • Case Name: BLAIS v. ST. MARY'S HEALTH SYSTEMS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Objection]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.