U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00018
  • Case Name: AJAX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2019-E MORTGAGED-BACKED SECURITIES SERIES 2019-E et al v. SARGENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed with Foreclosure on Paper Record]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.