U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: ROSNER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 24, 2022: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.