U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00052
  • Case Name: LIZOTTE v. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.