U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00170
  • Case Name: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST v. DIONNE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.