U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00187
  • Case Name: OPIO v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Objection]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.