U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00568
  • Case Name: ATER v. ATER, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.