U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00379
  • Case Name: DIXON-TRIBOU v. MCDONOUGH
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.