U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00220
  • Case Name: MOORE et al v. JOHN AND JANE DOE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.