U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00326
  • Case Name: WALSH v. MAINE OXY-ACETYLENE SUPPLY COMPANY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.