U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00290
  • Case Name: FULLER et al v. WVMF FUNDING LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.