U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00257
  • Case Name: PROGRESS ENGINEERING LLC v. BENNETT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.