U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00259
  • Case Name: BROWN v. RIEGER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.