U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRAGDON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Procedural Order in a Criminal Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.