U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORAN-STENSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Financial Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [Procedural Order in a Criminal Case]
  • October 06, 2022: [Rule 5 Endorsement Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.