U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GILLESPIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [FINAL Order of Forfeiture]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Order on Motion for Recommendation to Participate in the Strafford Therapeutic Community Program]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2022: [Procedural Order in a Criminal Case]
  • December 22, 2022: [Rule 5 Endorsement Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Financial Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.