U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DE LEON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File PSI]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.