U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00251
  • Case Name: FOX et al v. MAKIN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
  • February 06, 2025: [Order]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.