open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:13-19278
    Party Name:Samuel Forrest
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Returned Mail Notice to Party]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:August 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Notice Appointing Interim Trustee]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cosby, Ellen W. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?619781
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =