open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:15-16728
    Party Name:Angelo M Cooper
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disposition Without Hearing - CDP]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney (multi)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice (attorney/Trustee use)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Response]
    Date Published:March 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disallow Claims]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Objection]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Employ]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice (attorney/Trustee use)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Vacating Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Request]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Substitution of Attorney (multi)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Continuance of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [none]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Court Instruction]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Disposition Without Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?632068
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =