open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:12-25592
    Party Name:Mehrdad Nonahal Tehrani
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [none]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Redact and Restrict Public Access]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Returned Mail Notice to Party]
    Date Published:July 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Spencer, Grigsby Nancy [Response]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?602298
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =